This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/04/2022 at 01:26:20 (UTC).

The People v. Steven Williams

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Steven Williams. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Jr., Harold. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7992

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Jr., Harold

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Steven Michael Williams

San Bernardino, CA 92415-000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office Of The State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

A. Natasha Cortina

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Kathryn A. Kirschbaum

P.O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Sally Patrone Brajevich

9461 Charleville Blvd., Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice granted.; Notes: Respondent's Apr 19 2022, request is granted. Clerk of this court is directed to place record in E071337 with record in this case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondent's request for judicial notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Steven Michael Williams Attorney: Sally Patrone Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Steven Michael WilliamsAttorney: Sally Patrone Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Opposition to respondent's request for judicial notice is due w/in 15 days

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: R-1 in camera dtd April 30, 2021 re: distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Sealed document filed; Notes: R-1 in camera dtd April 30, 2021 and index (13 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (38 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (50 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Sally Brajevich for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Nov 2, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Nov 2, 2021; Steven Michael Williams

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: FSB17000744; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Jr., Harold

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sally P. Brajevich