This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/15/2022 at 03:34:42 (UTC).

The People v. Shinn et al.

Case Summary

On 11/01/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Shinn. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hunter, Eleanor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6256

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hunter, Eleanor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellants and Defendants

Edward Alcaraz Shinn

Los Angeles, CA 90086

Alfredo Landeros

Delano, CA 93216

Edgardo Andre Moreno

Los Angeles, CA 90086

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Donna L. Harris

Attorney at Donna L. Harris, Attorney at Law

7268 Murieta Drive #1193

Sloughhouse, CA 95683

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Victor Morse

3145 Geary Blvd. Pmb #232

San Francisco, CA 94118-3316

Eric R. Larson

330 J Street # 609

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: *NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Alfredo Landeros Attorney: Victor Morse -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Three extensions granted for a total of 92 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Alfredo LanderosAttorney: Victor Morse; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Three extensions granted for a total of 92 days:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 08/15/2022 By 33 Day(s) *NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 08/15/2022 By 33 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 08/12/2022 By 30 Day(s) *NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 08/12/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/13/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 07/13/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 07/13/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: order appointing Donna Harris counsel for appellant Shinn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: Moreno

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 11/02/2021 NOA - Edgardo MorenoPC 1237(a) - Appeal as to final judgment of conviction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.; Notes: Landeros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 11/02/2021 NOA - Alfredo LanderosPC 1237(a) - Appeal as to final judgment of conviction.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-9 (2589 Pages) R-12, ONE: Marsden Proceeding (dated Sept. 19, 2019). ONE: Sealed IN-CAMERA Hearing (dated Sept. 19, 2019). ONE: Sealed EX-PARTE Hearing (dated July 30, 2021). PR-1*as to appellants: Edward Shin; Edgardo Moreno; Alfredo Landeros

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 11/01/2021 NOA - Edward Alcaraz ShinnPC 1237(a) - Appeal as to final judgment of conviction. * * The 10/01/21 judgment date stated on appellant's NOA is incorrect, per DDES website judgment was on 11/01/21. * *

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: NA102184; Trial Court Judge: Hunter, Eleanor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: NA102184

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donna L. Harris

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Victor Morse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eric R. Larson