This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/05/2022 at 23:04:32 (UTC).

The People v. Samm, Jr.

Case Summary

On 05/18/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Samm, Jr. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Beronio, Janene. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6268

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Beronio, Janene

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Sterling Hodari Samm, Jr.

Woodland, CA 95776

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

John L. Staley

Attorney at Attorney at Law

12463 Rancho Bernardo Road No. 372

San Diego, CA 92128-2143

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Material due by 8/15/2022. ROBIE, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: by Appellant. Briefing time suspended pending ruling on the motion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: 1 vol. CT (31 pp.); 1 confidential probation report (pp. 3-25). Opening brief due: 08/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Material due by 7/26/2022. ROBIE, Acting P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: By Appellant. Briefing time suspended pending ruling on the motion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Modified criminal address.; Notes: Sterling Hodari Samm Jr. old address: Monroe Dentention Facility new address: California Men's Colony new address: P.O. Box 8103, San Luis Obispo CA 93409-8101 Per CDCR Inmate Locator website

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: John L. Staley for Appellant. AOB Due: 07/28/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: for Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned and re-sent.; Notes: Appellant's copy of letter informing the record on appeal was filed. Re- sent to updated address.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Modified criminal address.; Notes: Sterling Hodari Samm Jr. old address: California Men's Colony new address: Monroe Dentention Facility new address: 140A Tony Diaz Drive, Woodland CA 95776

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 Volume CT (277 pgs.), 1 Volume RT (23 pgs.). Appellant's Opening Brief due 7/19/22.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Appellant's second notice of appeal. Filed in the trial court 5/18/22. Includes request and order filed 5/20/22 granting Certificate of Probable Cause. Denial of resentencing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed in the trial court 5/18/22. Denial of resentencing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: CR20183971; Trial Court Judge: Beronio, Janene

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central California Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant