This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/24/2023 at 01:31:19 (UTC).

The People v. Salaam

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Salaam. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fraser, Jeffrey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1529

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fraser, Jeffrey

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Abdul Haleen Salaam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Johanna Pirko

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/21/2023

HearingDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Counsel for appellant has filed a brief stating no arguable issues can be found. If counsel has not already done so, they are directed to send the record of this appeal and a copy of appellant's brief to appellant immediately. The defendant personally is granted 30 days to file any supplemental brief deemed necessary. If no such supplemental brief is filed, the court may dismiss the appeal as abandoned. (People v. Delgadillo (2022) 14 Cal.5th 216.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketDescription: Wende brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Abdul Haleen Salaam Attorney: Johanna Pirko

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Due Date: 07/21/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Abdul Haleen Salaam

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/20/2023

DocketBrief: Wende brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Abdul Haleen SalaamAttorney: Johanna Pirko

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: CT-1 (8 pages); 1 Reporter's Affidavit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/19/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/12/2023

DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketDescription: Probation report filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-1 (71 pages); RT-1 (8 pages); 1 Reporter's Affidavit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Johanna Pirko for appellant

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed January 12, 2023 - Salaam

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCD193824; Trial Court Judge: Fraser, Jeffrey

[+] Read More [-] Read Less