This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/30/2023 at 09:02:23 (UTC).

The People v. Robinson

Case Summary

On 07/29/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Robinson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weis Birnstein, Lauren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3105

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weis Birnstein, Lauren

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Maclean Charles Robinson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Alan Eisner

Mark Schaeffer

Dmitry Gorin

Robert Walter Hill

Gerald M. Serlin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's abandonment of appeal and request to dismiss filed January 9, 2023, the appeal filed July 29, 2022, is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.316(b)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's abandonment of appeal and request to dismiss pursuant to 8.316 of the California Rules of Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-3 (631 Pages), R-3, PR-1 ** Notice sent 09/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Eisner Gorin LLP associate Benedon & Serlin LLP as co-counsel for appellant Maclean Charles Robinson.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 07/29/2022 NOA - Maclean Charles Robinson *** PRIVATE COUNSEL ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SA096742; Trial Court Judge: Weis Birnstein, Lauren

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less