This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/15/2023 at 13:05:38 (UTC).

The People v. Parsons

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Parsons. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jacobson, Morris. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7048

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jacobson, Morris

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Aaron Parsons

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

First District Appellate Project

John Wilder Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/29/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/29/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final On March 28, 2023, appellant's appointed appellate counsel filed a no issues statement in accordance with People v. Serrano (2012) 211 Cal.App.4th 496 (Serrano) and People v. Delgadillo (2022) 14 Cal.5th 216 (Delgadillo). On March 28, 2023, this court notified appellant of the right to file a supplemental letter or brief within 30 days, but he did not do so. Accordingly, the appeal is dismissed as abandoned. (Serrano, supra, 211 Cal.App.4th at p. 503; Delgadillo, supra, 14 Cal.5th at p. 232.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/26/2023

DocketDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Notes: On March 28, 2023, appellant's appointed appellate counsel filed a no issues statement in accordance with People v. Serrano (2012) 211 Cal.App.4th 496 (Serrano) and People v. Delgadillo (2022) 14 Cal.5th 216 (Delgadillo). On March 28, 2023, this court notified appellant of the right to file a supplemental letter or brief within 30 days, but he did not do so. Accordingly, the appeal is dismissed as abandoned. (Serrano, supra, 211 Cal.App.4th at p. 503; Delgadillo, supra, 14 Cal.5th at p. 232.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/13/2023

DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: The time for appellant to file a supplemental brief has expired. 06/06/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Consideration of the petition for writ of habeas corpus is deferred pending consideration of the related appeal in case No. A167048. The clerk shall file a copy of this order in case No. A167048, and serve this order upon all counsel in case No. A167048.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: J. Wilder Lee, attorney for appellant; request refers to record in prior case A129717

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: J. Wilder Lee, attorney for appellant, re sealed records

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDescription: Received letter from:; Notes: appellant Parsons, requesting copy of sealed record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: see Order filed Apr. 11, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: Notice re Delgadillo.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: Delgadillo brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Aaron Parsons Attorney: John Wilder Lee Serrano/Delgadillo brief

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketBrief: Delgadillo brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Aaron ParsonsAttorney: John Wilder Lee; Notes: Serrano/Delgadillo brief

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: J. Wilder Lee / Independent / 40 days

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Application for Appointment of Counsel and Declaration of Indigence

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record filed today. AOB due in 40 days.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/07/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-1, no reporter's transcript. The record is electronic.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/31/2023

DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: First District Appellate Project old address 1: 475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650 new address 1: 1212 Broadway, Suite 1200

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/13/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: H43763; Trial Court Judge: Jacobson, Morris

[+] Read More [-] Read Less