This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/09/2022 at 15:06:43 (UTC).

Montero-Flores v. Department of Justice

Case Summary

On 03/29/2022 Montero-Flores filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Justice. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Northup, Ronald. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5938

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Northup, Ronald

 

Party Details

Respondents, Interested Parties and Plaintiffs

The People

Miguel Montero-Flores

Stockton, CA 95205

Department of Justice

Defendant, Plaintiff and Appellant

Miguel Montero-Flores

Stockton, CA 95205

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Nelson C. Lu

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201

Plaintiff, Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Nelson C. Lu

Attorney at San Joaquin County Public Defender

P.O. Box 201030

Stockton, CA 95201

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Nicole Devencenzi

Attorney at San Joaquin County District Attorney

222 E. Weber Ave

Stockton, CA 95202

Anthony P. O'Brien

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Respondent and Interested Party Attorney

Nicole Devencenzi

Attorney at San Joaquin County District Attorney

222 E. Weber Ave

Stockton, CA 95202

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final Petition for Transfer Denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transfer/certification denied.; Notes: The petition for transfer filed on March 29, 2022, is denied. Raye, P.J., Robie, J., Renner, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer - petition for transfer; Notes: By respondent, Department of Justice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer - petition for transfer; Notes: By respondent for the People.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: From Respondents. A petition for transfer from the appellate division has been filed in the above case. Before acting on this matter, respondent is requested to file an answer to the petition for transfer on or before April 22, 2022. (See Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1006, subd. (d)(1).) Due to the time constraints within which this court must act, no extensions of time will be granted by the court. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1008(a)(1)(A).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed original superior court file.; Notes: 1 Vol. paper CT (278 pgs.) Trial court record on petition to transfer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition to transfer from appellate division filed.; Notes: By Public Defender Nelson Lu on behalf of appellant Montero-Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Joaquin County Superior Court; County: San Joaquin; Trial Court Case Number: STKCRMI20190005376; Trial Court Judge: Northup, Ronald

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases where Department of Justice is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nelson C. Lu