This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/08/2022 at 02:21:53 (UTC).

The People v. Lyft, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Lyft, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schulman, Ethan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0701

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schulman, Ethan

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellants and Defendants

Lyft, Inc.

Uber Technologies, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

Shinobu Ichino

Martina Hassett

Sean Puttick

Marissa Gutierrez

Danitza Munoz

David Torres

Amicus Curiae

The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America

Denise Alvarado, Mimi Fan, et al.

Lawyers Committee for Civil Rights of the San Francisco Bay Area

La Raza Centro Legals Workers Rights Program

Centro Legal de la Raza

Worksafe, Inc.

Gig Workers Rising

UNITE HERE

California Labor Federation

California Employment Lawyers Association

Rideshare Drivers United

30 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew D. Goldberg

Attorney at Office of the San Francisco City Attorney

1390 Market Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102-5408

Satoshi Yanai

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Minsu D. Longiaru

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Marisa Beth Hernandez-Stern

Attorney at California Department of Justice

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Mana Barari

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Rosa Erandi Zamora

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1515 Clay Street, 20Th Floor P.O. Box 70550

Oakland, CA 94612-0550

Michael J. Bostrom

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 North Spring St., 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Mark D. Ankcorn

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

Kevin B. King

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

Marni Lynn Von Wilpert

Attorney at San Diego City Attorney's Office

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101-4100

Yvonne R. Mere

Attorney at Office of the San Francisco City Attorney

1390 Market Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102

Molly J. Alarcon

Attorney at Office of the San Francisco City Attorney

1390 Market Street, Sixth Floor

San Francisco, CA 94102-5408

Sara J. Eisenberg

Attorney at Office of the San Francisco City Attorney

1390 Market Street, Sixthfloor

San Francisco, CA 94102-5408

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Rohit K. Singla

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105-3089

Jeffrey Y. Wu

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Benjamin G. Barokh

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Christa M. Anderson

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Rachael E. Meny

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

R. James Slaughter

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

Elizabeth K. McCloskey

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

30 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

A160701

Court of Appeal Opinion

A160701M

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The petitions for review are denied. The requests for an order directing depublication of the opinion are denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting of denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including March 1, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: Lyft Inc.'s Reply in Support of Petition for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: On application of respondent, the request to file a combined answer to the petitions for review hereby is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Uber, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By Lyft, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Mod. of opinion filed (no change in judgment).; Notes: & denying petitions for rehearing;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: "Exhibit B proposed order"

    Read MoreRead Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol 7, pages 1517-1571

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol 6, pages 1232-1516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol 5, pages 945-1231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 4, pages 719-944

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol 3, pages 457-718

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol 2, pages 160-456

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 1, pages 1-159

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: petition for writ of supersedeas by Lyft Inc.; request for immeidate stayDue to power outage in Civic Center for several hours on 8/14/20, appeal case number was assigned later in the day

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20584402; Trial Court Judge: Schulman, Ethan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RIDESHARE DRIVERS UNITED is a litigant

Latest cases where Worksafe is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA EMPLOYMENT LAWYERS ASSOCIATION is a litigant