This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/27/2022 at 03:10:44 (UTC).

The People v. Loeffler

Case Summary

On 05/17/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Loeffler. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hall, Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1399

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hall, Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Sean Richard Loeffler

Oceanside, CA 92056

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office Of The State Attorney General

P O Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Helen Irza

Attorney at Appellate Defenders Inc.

555 W. Beech St., Ste. 300

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented reporter's transcript filed; Notes: 1 RT, pages 1-38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: G. Solorio, W. Torres, C. Dugas, M. Lozano

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Appellant's request to augment the record on appeal is GRANTED. Orange County Superior Court, Criminal Department, Felony Appeals is directed to prepare and transmit to this court a supplemental transcript as outlined in the attached request. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that copies of the augmentation be furnished to counsel of record for appellant and the Attorney General. The supplemental transcript must be filed no later than September 21, 2022. Appellant is granted 30 days from the filing of the augmentation to file appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Filed by appellant. Requsting an extension of time to file the aob

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Filed by appellant. Requsting an extension of time to file the aob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 09/14/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: EOT from APLT must be signed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: 8 CT envelopes. Pages 101-103 (Addendum) pages 104-109 (contested restitution) pages 112-116 (Progress Report) pages 117-127 (Correspondence) pages 151-256 (Redacted documents from California Victim Compensation Board) pages 257-440 (Redacted documents from California Victim Compensation Board) pages 441-503 (Points and authorities) pages 504-509 (Progress report)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 CT, pages 1-512 1 RT, pages 1-37

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Helen Irza is appointed as counsel on appeal for appellant. This will be an ADI Staff case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: A. Hogate, J. Jennings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Appellant: Sean Richard Loeffler Sentence: Pay $13,114.48 restitution plus 10% interest from the date of sentencing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 19HF1221; Trial Court Judge: Hall, Edward

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helen Simkins Irza