This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/24/2021 at 00:23:39 (UTC).

The People v. Livingston

Case Summary

On 07/23/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Livingston. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcus, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6775

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Marcus, Stephen

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Kayveon Livingston

Los Angeles, CA 90086

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Edward J. Haggerty

Attorney at Law Offices of Edward J. Haggerty

20955 Pathfinder Road, Suite 100

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: in re rule 8 letter dtd 12.15.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: [AOB +30]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Supplemental record/transcript filed. Due on 03/01/2021 By 46 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Supplemental record/transcript filed. Requested for 02/08/2021 By 25 Day(s) Extension of time by CSR, Lisa Luna.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's request to stay briefing is granted in part. Appellant's opening brief is now due February 1, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: SCLA Crim Appeal in re rule 8 letter dtd 12.15.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Appellant's letter of omission dated December 15, 2020, re missing portion of the record on appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: in re rule letter dtd 10.15.20C-1 (57 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: SCLA Crim Appeals in re rule letter dtd 10.15.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Suspend briefing.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kayveon Livingston Attorney: Edward J. Haggerty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Appellant's letter of omission dated October 15, 2020, re missing portion of the record on appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketBrief: Suspend briefing.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kayveon LivingstonAttorney: Edward J. Haggerty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Edward Haggerty for Appellant Livingston.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (280 Pages) R-10, PR-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: CSR B. Lui re GEX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 10/05/2020 By 24 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Requested for 10/04/2020 By 24 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 07/23/2020 Kayveon Livingston

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BA445708; Trial Court Judge: Marcus, Stephen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward J. Haggerty