This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/19/2022 at 00:30:11 (UTC).

The People v. K.R.

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against K R. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Garcia, Lupe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3523

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Garcia, Lupe

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

K. R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

First District Appellate Project

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Kevin J. Lindsley

Attorney at The Law Office of Kevin J. Lindsley

Po Box 852

Mi Wuk Village, CA 95346

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: *** 15 days after omission is filed ******Further extensions not contemplated.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/16/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 06/16/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 05/16/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 05/16/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/15/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/15/2022 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.; Notes: Reporter's Transcript 4/2/218.340 augment complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.; Notes: Reporter's Transcript 3/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Appellant's omission letter requesting - RT March 19, 2021 - RT April 2, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record Filed AOB due in 40 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1,R-1 Clerk's Transcript Filed through TAP Reporter's Transcript is attached and in P Drive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcript Vol.1 Confidential

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: Clerk's Transcript Vol. 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Kevin Lindsley - Independent, 40 days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed on 9/20/21 by Defendant K.R. (Minor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: JV028279; Trial Court Judge: Garcia, Lupe

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin J. Lindsley