This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/29/2022 at 03:08:31 (UTC).

The People v. Joaquin Flores

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Joaquin Flores. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gallon, Stephen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7314

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gallon, Stephen

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellants and Defendants

Joaquin Flores

Wasco, CA 93280

Joaquin Joseph Flores

Wasco, CA 93280

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office Of The State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Steven Taylor Oetting

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Nicolai Cocis

Attorney at Law Office of Nicolai Cocis

25026 Las Brisas Rd

Murrieta, CA 92562

 

Court Documents

E077314

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: dtd Jun 22, 2022 (appellant) S274646

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Slough, Marsha; Participants: McKinster, Art W. (Concur) Fields, Richard Todd (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Apr 5, 2022 @ 1:30 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued tentative opinion or disputed issued memo; Notes: argue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: supplemental clerk's transcript filed; Notes: C-1 (132 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice re: retained counsel filed.; Notes: Atty Nicolaie Cocis for Applnt Joaquin Flores; time to file AOB extended to Sep 29, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RMI-1, R-2 (334 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-1 (233 pgs) (233 pgs includes p.o. report)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Jun 28, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Jun 25, 2021; Joaquin Flores

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: SWF1900340; Trial Court Judge: Gallon, Stephen

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicolai Cocis