This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/31/2022 at 04:05:56 (UTC).

The People v. Jetson *WENDE*

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Jetson WENDE. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dominguez, Juan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9737

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dominguez, Juan

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Timothy DaWayne Jetson

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Sally P. Brajevich

9461 Charleville Blvd., # 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's June 30, 2022 request for dismissal, the appeal filed April 6, 2022 is dismissed. The remittitur shall issue forthwith.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: No merit brief letter sent.; Notes: All counsel and appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Wende brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Timothy DaWayne Jetson Attorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Wende brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Timothy DaWayne JetsonAttorney: Sally P. Brajevich

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Sally Brajevich is appointed counsel for appellant Timothy Jetson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (167 Pages) R-1, PR-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 04/06/2022 NOA - Timothy Dawayne Jetson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: KA106873; Trial Court Judge: Dominguez, Juan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sally P. Brajevich