This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/13/2023 at 20:40:11 (UTC).

The People v. Jensen

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Jensen. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCormick, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7822

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

McCormick, Kevin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Keith Hugh Jensen

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Kenneth N. Sokoler

Office of the State Attorney General

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Michele A. Douglass

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2023

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Kenneth N. Sokoler

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Kenneth N. Sokoler

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's request for extension of time to file the respondent's brief is granted. The respondent's brief is to be served and filed by September 15, 2023. The court does not contemplate granting any further extensions of time for filing the respondent's brief absent an exceptional showing of good cause. EARL, P.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent to 09/15/23 to file respondent's brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/18/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent to 08/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent to 08/16/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Keith Hugh Jensen Attorney: Michele A. Douglass

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Keith Hugh JensenAttorney: Michele A. Douglass

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/23/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that supplemental record has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
04/24/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's application to obtain a copy of the sealed material filed in this court on March 15, 2023, is granted. The clerk of this court is directed to send a copy of the requested sealed material marked confidential to Attorney Michele Douglass only. ROBIE, Acting P.J.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/11/2023

DocketDescription: Motion/request for sealed or confidential transcripts filed by:; Notes: Appellant.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Michele A. Douglass for Appellant. AOB Due: 05/01/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief due 04/24/23.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/15/2023

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 4 Vol. CT (1028 pp.); 1 Confidential notice of motion to withdraw plea of guilty dated 06/22/22 (CT pp. 166-183); 1 Confidential notice of motion that court find unusual case for purposes of granting probation dated 06/22/22 (CT pp. 192-197); 1 Confidential addendum to motion to withdraw plea of guilty/no contest dated 06/22/23 (CT pp. 247-257); 1 Confidential people's opposition to defendant's motion to withdraw guilty plea filed 08/01/22 (CT pp. 273-291); 1 Confidential notice of nonstatutory motion to dismiss dated 06/22/23 (CT pp. 427-472); 1 Confidential notice of motion and substitution of counsel dated 11/29/22 (CT pp. 982-993); 1 Confidential counsel's response to defendant's substitution of counsel dated 12/20/22 (CT pp. 994-995); 1 Confidential Probation report dated 05/05/23 (CT pp. 1003-1013); 10 Vol. Electronic RT (197 pp.); 1 Confidential electronic RT (RT pp. 139-149); 1 Confidential electronic RT (RT 160-163).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Abby Reisig to 03/16/23. Has completed 2 of 3 hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/30/2023

DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR Abby Reisig to 03/16/23. Has completed 2 of 3 hours.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/12/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed in the superior court on 01/12/2023. Theft unlawful driving/Taking of vehicle.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 22FE006188; Trial Court Judge: McCormick, Kevin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less