This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/09/2021 at 00:03:05 (UTC).

The People v. Hector Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 11/03/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Hector Gonzalez. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hawkins, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6052

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hawkins, James

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Hector Gonzalez

San Diego, CA 92101-2396

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Stephanie Marie Adraktas

2625 Alcatraz Avenue #233

Berkeley, CA 94705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Case in basement storage.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Applnt's rqst for dismissal. Remittitur is ordered to issue immediately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Dismissal order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: By appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: abandonment of appeal; submit a request for dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: abandonment of appeal/dismissal; pages upside down and illegible.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Extn to file AOB - submitted filing contains a note indicating "This file claims compliance with the PDF/A standard and has been opened read-only to prevent modification." If counsel would save in a different way so that the clerk is able to modify the document with signatures/stamps.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2, R-2, RMI-1, C-1 sealed & index & rec'd sealed P.O. report (874 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: appellate counsel w/transmission of exhibits form attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Stephanie Adraktas for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended dtd Nov 6, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Nov 4, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Dtd Nov 3, 2020; Hector Gonzalez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIF1804246; Trial Court Judge: Hawkins, James

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Adraktas