This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/01/2022 at 01:53:03 (UTC).

The People v. Harris

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Harris. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Yudkowsky, Alan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0310

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Yudkowsky, Alan

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Harry Vondale Harris

Delano, CA 93216

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Peggy Z. Huang

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

300 S. Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Micah R. Reyner

1 Kaiser Plaza, Suite 2300

Oakland, CA 94612-1427

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 12/27/2022 By 29 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 12/27/2022 By 29 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Harry Vondale Harris Attorney: Micah R. Reyner Two extensions granted for a total of 46 days: 09/13/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/17/2022 By 32 Day(s) 09/13/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/17/2022 By 32 Day(s) 10/13/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/31/2022 By 14 Day(s) 10/14/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/31/2022 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 12/27/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Peggy Z. Huang

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Harry Vondale HarrisAttorney: Micah R. Reyner; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 46 days: 09/13/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/17/2022 By 32 Day(s) 09/13/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/17/2022 By 32 Day(s) 10/13/2022 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 10/31/2022 By 14 Day(s) 10/14/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 10/31/2022 By 14 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Appellant's letter directed to superior court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Micah Reyner for appellant Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (283 Pages) R-2, PR-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 05/12/2022 NOA - Harry Vondale Harris

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: MA082122; Trial Court Judge: Yudkowsky, Alan

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Micah R. Reyner