This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/17/2022 at 07:26:53 (UTC).

The People v. Gobert

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Gobert. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Jackson, Jacqueline. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0018

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Jackson, Jacqueline

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Latravius Brian Gobert

Wasco, CA 93280

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office Of The State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Britton Branstad Lacy

Attorney at State Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Ste. 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 W. Broadway, Ste. 1800 P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Donna L. Harris

Attorney at Donna L. Harris, Attorney at Law

7268 Murieta Drive, #1193

Sloughhouse, CA 95683

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On the Court's own motion, the record is augmented with the confidential documents reviewed at the March 6, 2020, in camera hearing. The Clerk of the superior court, appeal division, is ORDERED, on or before 15 days from the date of this order, to transmit to the court in a confidential envelope the items reviewed by the Honorable Samuel Diaz, Jr. at the in camera hearing held on March 6, 2020. If the confidential items are not available, Judge Diaz is directed to hold a hearing on or before 30 days from the date of this order to "settle the record." At the hearing to settle the record, the custodian of records for the Riverside County Sheriff's Department is ORDERED to provide to Judge Diaz copies of the documents reviewed at the in camera hearing held on March 6, 2020. Judge Diaz is directed to certify that the items produced by the custodian of records are the same documents reviewed on March 6, 2020. The Clerk of the Riverside County Superior Court shall, on or before 35 days from the date of this order, transmit UNDER SEAL and TO THIS COURT ONLY a copy of the settled record of the items reviewed by Judge Diaz at the in camera hearing held on March 6, 2020. (People v. Mooc (2001) 26 Cal.4th 1216, 1228-1229; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.346.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 8/31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Due Date: 08/22/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Latravius Brian GobertAttorney: Donna L. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Kristen Kinnaird Chenelia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified pursuant to rule 8.220(a)(2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Latravius Brian Gobert Attorney: Donna L. Harris

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Sealed document filed******; Notes: R-1 in-camera dtd March 6, 2020 & index

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: RMI-1, R-4 (747 pgs includes R-1 in camera dtd March 6, 2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (530 pgs includes p.o. report)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Susan K. Shaler for Latravius Brian Gobert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Oct 5, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Oct 4, 2021; Latravius Brian Gobert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIF1801370; Trial Court Judge: Jackson, Jacqueline

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donna L. Harris