This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/07/2022 at 02:57:29 (UTC).

The People v. Garrett

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Garrett. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Conroy, Brendan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4032

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Conroy, Brendan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Gregory Garrett

Soledad, CA 93960

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

First District Appellate Project

Attorney at First District Appellate Project

475 Fourteenth Street, Suite 650

Oakland, CA 94612

Larenda Rai Delaini

1520 East Covell Boulevard Suite B5, Pmb 384

Davis, CA 95616

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: Notice of Abandonment; Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: CSR B. Crow to 2/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension requested.; Notes: CSR B. Crow to 2/6/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Dated 12/19/21 by attorney Larenda Delaini for appellant Garrett to SF Superior Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Larenda Delaini for appellant Garrett (Assisted/50) aob to 2/3/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record filed today. AOB due in 40 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: electronic reporter's transcript filed; Notes: RT-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Alternate Lower Court Case #: CT2299658

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: SCN202541; Trial Court Judge: Conroy, Brendan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CT2299658; Trial Court Judge: Conroy, Brendan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELAINI LARENDA RAI