This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/01/2022 at 01:18:57 (UTC).

The People v. Frazier

Case Summary

On 03/24/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Frazier. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katz, Aaron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0220

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Katz, Aaron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Martel Miguel Frazier

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

John L. Staley

12463 Rancho Bernardo Road No. 372

San Diego, CA 92128

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: ***EXHIBITS LODGED BY: ******

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: Sealed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • HearingDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: Corrected record per 6/8/22 orderAppellant's opening brief is due 30 days after the corrected record is filed with this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit request rule 8.224 by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Appellant's motion to augment the record on appeal, filed May 31, 2022, is GRANTED IN PART. The motion is granted as to the sealed psychiatric report. The Clerk of the San Diego County Superior Court is directed to directed to prepare and transmit to this court a SEALED supplemental transcript with the report. Copies of the SEALED transcript shall be furnished to counsel of record. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 8.45(d).) The motion is denied with respect to the exhibits. Appellant is directed to have exhibits transmitted to this court under California Rules of Court, rule 8.224. The sealed supplemental transcript shall be filed by the date the corrected record is filed, pursuant to this court's order of June 8, 2022. Appellant's opening brief remains due within 30 days after the corrected and supplemental records are filed with this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's counsel has filed a letter dated May 31, 2022, stating appellant was convicted of trafficking, pimping, and pandering offenses, and two volumes of the record on appeal contain the full name of the victim, who was a juvenile at the time. The Clerk of this Court has identified additional impacted record volumes. Consistent with the policy of protective nondisclosure; the overriding interest in protecting such individuals; and the absence of narrower means to prevent substantial prejudice to this interest, the Court determines the victim's full name should have been withheld and is hereby sealed. (Rule 2.550(d); NBC Subsidiary (KNBC-TV), Inc. v. Superior Court (1999) 20 Cal.4th 1178, 1217-1218, 1222 fn. 46.) The Clerk of this Court is ordered to strike the record. The Clerk of the San Diego County Superior Court is directed to prepare a corrected record, which redacts the victim's name and replaces it with first and last initial. Upon receipt of the corrected record, counsel shall destroy their former copies. The corrected record is due 30 days from the date of this order. Appellant's opening brief is due 30 days after the corrected record is filed with this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Appellant re victim's name in the record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Appellant -- with EOT request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed.; Notes: ** Stricken per 6/8/22 order **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: ** Stricken per 6/8/22 order **

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: John L. Staley for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed March 24, 2022 - Frazier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCD289037; Trial Court Judge: Katz, Aaron

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L. Staley