This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/08/2022 at 02:48:51 (UTC).

The People v. Estrada

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Estrada. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Joan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0429

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weber, Joan

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Manuel Garcia Estrada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Helen Simkins Irza

Attorney at Appellate Defenders, Inc.

555 West Beech Street, Ste. 300

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF. Due on 09/01/2022 By 30 Day(s) No further extensions are contemplated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-1 (142 pages); RT-8 (546 pages); PH-1 (90 pages); 1 master index; probation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Helen Irza for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed April 29, 2022 - Estrada

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCD287834; Trial Court Judge: Weber, Joan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helen Simkins Irza