This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/04/2022 at 04:03:06 (UTC).

The People v. Espeso

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Espeso. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3617

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

The People

Appellate Division of The Superior Court

Defendant and Appellant

Beau Everette Espeso

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

The Honorable Patti Jo McKay

Attorney at Appellate Division Los Angeles Superior Court

111 N. Hill Street, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. David K. Reinert

Torrance Courthouse 825 Maple Ave., Dept 005

Torrance, CA 90503

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Robert S. Ernenwein

Attorney at The Law Offices of Robert Ernenwein, PC

1405 Crenshaw Blvd. 2Nd Fl

Torrance, CA 90501

Michelle Ann Mathes

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF ROBERT ERNENWEIN PC

1405 Crenshaw Blvd Fl 2

Torrance, CA 90501-2434

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.; Notes: One volume in one Redweld Folder (BS175803/0TR04543)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final The opinion of the Appellate Department of the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles having been filed on July 14, 2021, that court having made its order for publication of the opinion in the Advance Appellate Reports, and that opinion having been examined by this Court within thirty (30) days after the decision of the Appellate Department became final, this Court has determined that transfer under California Rules of Court, rules 8.1002 and 8.1008, is unnecessary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transfer/certification denied.; Notes: The opinion of the Appellate Department of the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles having been filed on July 14, 2021, that court having made its order for publication of the opinion in the Advance Appellate Reports, and that opinion having been examined by this Court within thirty (30) days after the decision of the Appellate Department became final, this Court has determined that transfer under California Rules of Court, rules 8.1002 and 8.1008, is unnecessary.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: One volume in one Redweld Folder (BS175803/0TR04543)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certification from appellate division filed.; Notes: Certification from appellate division filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Appellate Division of the Superior Court is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert S. Ernenwein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAMBERS MICHELLE ANN