This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 05/11/2021 at 02:53:51 (UTC).

The People v. Dixon

Case Summary

On 11/05/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Dixon. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hom, Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2798

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Third Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hom, Russell

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Defendant and Appellant

Marquel Dixon

Susanville, CA 96127-3030

Not Yet Classified

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Max Feinstat

Attorney at Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Darren K. Indermill

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Jeffrey Kross

Attorney at Attorney at Law

P.O. Box 2252

Sebastopol, CA 95473-2252

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Marquel Dixon Attorney: Jeffrey Kross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Marquel DixonAttorney: Jeffrey Kross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Darren K. Indermill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Darren K. Indermill

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: appellant's Attorney Jeffrey S. Kross, email address for all purposes of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed application and order of:; Notes: Respondent granting extension to 3/8/2021 to file respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice granted.; Notes: Appellant's request for judicial notice is granted. RAYE, P.J., MAURO, J., MURRAY, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Marquel Dixon Attorney: Jeffrey Kross

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for judicial notice filed.; Notes: By Appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 1 vol. CT (207 pgs.); 1 vol. RT (13 pgs.), 1 confidential probation report (pgs. 31-51). Appellant's opening brief due: 1/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed C.C.A.P. recommendation for counsel.; Notes: for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed application and order of:; Notes: CSR Araceli Plasencia granting extension to 12/15/20 to file the record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 11/15/20. Denial of PC 1170.95 petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Defendant's request for permission to file a notice of appeal under the constructive filing doctrine is granted, and the notice will be deemed a timely notice of appeal for all purposes of appellate review. The trial court clerk is ordered to file the attached notice of appeal as of the date this order is received, provide this court with a copy of the notice on or before November 13, 2020, and proceed with preparation of the record on appeal. RAYE, P.J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The Attorney General. A request for constructive filing of a notice of appeal has been filed in the above case. Before acting on this matter, the People are afforded the opportunity to serve and file written opposition with this court by October 29, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Request filed:; Notes: by appellant for an order permitting the filing of a notice of appeal more than 60 days after sentencing under the constructive filing doctrine (In re Benoit (1973) 10 Ca.3d 72). (Includes notice of appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Sacramento County Superior Court; County: Sacramento; Trial Court Case Number: 10F00253; Trial Court Judge: Hom, Russell

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central California Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant