This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/06/2022 at 20:05:35 (UTC).

The People v. Deaton

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Deaton. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Williams, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5776

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Williams, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Jeremy Deaton

Woodland, CA 95776

Not Yet Classified

Cemtral California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Office of the State Attorney General

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

David W. Beaudreau

Attorney at Attorney at Law

748 South Meadows Parkway Suite A9-182

Reno, NV 89521

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Central California Appellate Program

2150 River Plaza Drive, Suite 300

Sacramento, CA 95833

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that augmented record has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmented record filed.; Notes: 1 vol. CT (45 pp.). Opening brief due: 08/12/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Appellant's. Material due: 07/19/2022. Briefing time suspended pending filing of augmented record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising that supplemental record has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: 1 vol. CT (33 pp.); 1 Declaration of Operations Supervisor, M. Potts, advising Defense Exhibit B2 was returned to the offering party. Briefing time is remains suspended pending ruling on motion to augment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: by appellant addressed to Yolo County Superior Court, dated 06/22/2022, requesting omitted exhibits. Briefing time is suspended pending ruling on motion to augment and filing of supplemental record.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: by appellant. Briefing time is suspended pending ruling on motion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 vols. CT (386 pp.); 2 vols. RT (462 pp.); Sealed portion of CT: 1 Law Enforcement Report (pp. 10-12); 1 confidential probation report (pp. 351-374). Opening brief due: 07/06/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: David W. Beaudreau for Appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application/recommendation req. for counsel filed.; Notes: for Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: CSR C. Brickner to 05/16/2022, to file original RT. LAST EXTENSION. Rule 8.336(e)(2) letter sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: CSR C. Brickner requesting to 05/16/2022, to file original RT. Completed 2 hours of estimated 80 hours.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 02/23/2022. Transport controlled substance, etc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Yolo County Superior Court- Main; County: Yolo; Trial Court Case Number: CRF20211606; Trial Court Judge: Williams, Peter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Central California Appellate Program is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant