This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/07/2021 at 00:28:52 (UTC).

The People v. Davis

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Davis. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weis Birnstein, Lauren. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7686

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weis Birnstein, Lauren

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

The People

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Petitioner, Appellant and Defendant

Cobert Davis

Vacaville, CA 95696-4000

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

320 W. Temple St. #540

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 210 W. Temple St., Dept. 1

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Eric R. Larson

330 J Street # 609

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 05/05/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 05/05/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/05/2021 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/05/2021 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Eric Larson for appellant Davis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1 (39 Pages) R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of habeas corpus filed September 24, 2020. The superior court is directed to file the petition as a notice of appeal from the superior court's July 29, 2020 order summarily denying petitioner's Penal Code section 1170.95 petition. The notice of appeal is to be treated as if filed on September 24, 2020, the date this petition was filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Pursuant to the order of October 20, 2020. The petition is construed as a notice of appeal filed as of this date September 24, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: SA006461; Trial Court Judge: Weis Birnstein, Lauren

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant