This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/21/2023 at 01:17:35 (UTC).

Ventura County Human Services Agency v. J.J. et al. **366.26**

Case Summary

On 09/29/2022 Ventura County Human Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against J J 366 26. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cody, Tari. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3577

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cody, Tari

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Ventura County Human Services Agency

Defendants and Appellants

J. J.

S. C.

Not Yet Classified

N. J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

David Yorton

California Appellate Project

Johanna R. Shargel

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Thomas Alan Young

 

Court Documents

B323577

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final AFF/BGY/11 pgs.; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Baltodano, Hernaldo J.; Participants: Yegan, Kenneth R. (Concur) Gilbert, Arthur (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) AFF/BGY/11 pgs.The juvenile court's order terminating Mother's and Father's parental rights and selecting adoption as the permanent plan, entered September 21, 2022, is affirmed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived, cause submitted.; Notes: Wednesday May 10, 2023, at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Joseph Randazzo for respondent / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attoreny David Yorton for appellant J.J. / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Johanna Shargel for appellant S.C. / WAIVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: Wednesday May 10, 2023, at 1:30 pm

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. J. Attorney: David Yorton

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 01/11/2023 By 21 Day(s) Appellant's Opening Brief (J.J.- father) Requested first extension to 1/11/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Johanna Shargel for appellant S.C., mother (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: David Yorton for appellant J.J., father (AOB + 30)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-3 (437), RT-11 (399), Confidential CT-1 (11)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 10/18/2022 by S.C. (mother); from 09/21/2022 termination of parental rights.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 9-29-22 from VCSC - amended NTR to change assigned court reporter on 2-24-22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 09/29/2022 by J.J. (father); from 09/21/2022 termination of parental rights, 09/09/2022 denial of reunification services and 09/22/2022 denial of requesting visitation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J073039; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less