***3577
09/29/2022
Pending - Other Pending
Other
Statewide, California
Cody, Tari
Ventura County Human Services Agency
J. J.
S. C.
N. J.
Office of the County Counsel
800 S. Victoria Ave. Administration Building
Ventura, CA 93009
California Appellate Project
520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor
Los Angeles, CA 90071
David Yorton
Attorney at Law Offices of David Yorton
3335 Placer Street, Pmb 111
Redding, CA 96001
Johanna R. Shargel
2632 Wilshire Blvd #284
Santa Monica, CA 90403-4623
Thomas Alan Young
674 County Square Drive # 102
Ventura, CA 93003
Court documents are not available for this case.
HearingDescription: Opinion filed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Case fully briefed.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. J. Attorney: David Yorton
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: S. C. Attorney: Johanna R. Shargel
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. J.Attorney: David Yorton
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: S. C.Attorney: Johanna R. Shargel
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: Ventura County Human Services Agency Attorney: Office of the County Counsel
[-] Read LessDocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Ventura County Human Services AgencyAttorney: Office of the County Counsel
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 02/21/2023 By 18 Day(s)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 02/21/2023 By 18 Day(s) 2/21
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 01/11/2023 By 21 Day(s) Appellant's Opening Brief (J.J.- father) Requested first extension to 1/11/2023
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Johanna Shargel for appellant S.C., mother (AOB + 30)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: David Yorton for appellant J.J., father (AOB + 30)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-3 (437), RT-11 (399), Confidential CT-1 (11)
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 10/18/2022 by S.C. (mother); from 09/21/2022 termination of parental rights.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: dtd 9-29-22 from VCSC - amended NTR to change assigned court reporter on 2-24-22
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: ********FAST TRACK APPEAL********
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.
[-] Read LessDocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A dated 09/29/2022 by J.J. (father); from 09/21/2022 termination of parental rights, 09/09/2022 denial of reunification services and 09/22/2022 denial of requesting visitation.
[-] Read LessDocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: J073039; Trial Court Judge: Cody, Tari
[-] Read Less