This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/28/2021 at 00:23:05 (UTC).

The People v. Chavez

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Chavez. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Herscovitz, Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8332

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Herscovitz, Martin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Pablo Deen Chavez

Blythe, CA 92226

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

California Appellate Project

520 S. Grand Avenue 4Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Thomas T. Ono

1055 West Seventh Street, Suite 1780

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2536

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Pablo Deen Chavez Attorney: Thomas T. Ono [ Filed with permission from the court. ]Two extensions granted for a total of 62 days: 01/15/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/16/2021 By 32 Day(s) 01/15/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/16/2021 By 32 Day(s) 02/16/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s) 02/16/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s) 03/18/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/22/2021 By 4 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 04/21/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Pablo Deen ChavezAttorney: Thomas T. Ono; Notes: [ Filed with permission from the court. ]Two extensions granted for a total of 62 days: 01/15/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 02/16/2021 By 32 Day(s) 01/15/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/16/2021 By 32 Day(s) 02/16/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s) 02/16/2021 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/18/2021 By 30 Day(s) 03/18/2021 Requested - extension of time. Requested for 03/22/2021 By 4 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: [ NO ACTION TAKEN. OPENING BRIEF FILED BEFORE RULING ISSUED. BRIEF FILED WITH PERMISSION FROM THE COURT. ]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Thomas Ono for appellant Chavez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-2 (376 Pages) R-1, PR-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: N/A sent to CAP for appointment recommendation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: 09/24/2020 Pablo Deen Chavez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: LA038760

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: LA038760; Trial Court Judge: Herscovitz, Martin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant