This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/08/2022 at 05:06:30 (UTC).

The People v. Cave

Case Summary

On 09/28/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Cave. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cookson, Patricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9440

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cookson, Patricia

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Kevin J. Cave

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Dolida

Attorney at Attorney General

600 West Broadway, Ste. 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Helen Simkins Irza

555 West Beech Street, Ste. 300

San Diego, CA 92101

Sheila Lavery O'Connor

P.O. Box 232726

Encinitas, CA 92023

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 8/24/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Plaintiff and Respondent: The People Attorney: Michael Dolida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Due Date: 08/15/2022; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kevin J. CaveAttorney: Sheila Lavery O'Connor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Michael Dolida

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified pursuant to rule 8.220(a)(2).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: No further extensions are contemplated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Kevin J. Cave Attorney: Sheila Lavery O'Connor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Kevin J. CaveAttorney: Sheila Lavery O'Connor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-2 (307 pages); RT-11 (1,263 pages); PH-1 (150 pages); 1 master index; 16 years 8 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Sheila O'Connor for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed on 9/28/21 - Cave

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Defendant's application to file a late notice of appeal is GRANTED. The Clerk of the San Diego County Superior Court is directed to file defendant's notice of appeal if tendered within 10 days from the date of this order. The appeal is to be processed under the above case number.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: For constructive notice of appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCE379012; Trial Court Judge: Cookson, Patricia

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Helen Simkins Irza

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sheila Lavery O'Connor