This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/04/2022 at 01:27:55 (UTC).

The People v. Burns

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Burns. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stone, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0239

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stone, Steven

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Derrick Lyle Burns

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

John L. Staley

12463 Rancho Bernardo Road No. 372

San Diego, CA 92128

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Opposition filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion/application to augment record filed.; Notes: Appellant -- with EOT request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: CT-1 (173 pages); RT-2 (105 pages); 19 years 8 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: John L. Staley for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed April 4, 2022 - Burns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCD273861; Trial Court Judge: Stone, Steven

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John L. Staley