This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 03/16/2021 at 02:21:40 (UTC).

The People v. Bryan Webb

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Bryan Webb. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ferguson, Jon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5744

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ferguson, Jon

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Bryan Lamar Webb

San Diego, CA 92101-2396

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Stephanie Marie Adraktas

2625 Alcatraz Avenue #233

Berkeley, CA 94705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: Opinion filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Cause submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.; Notes: No supp brief by appellant re Wende

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Wende order filed.; Notes: Appellant is granted 30 days to file supp brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Standard Letter Brief Deemed filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Wende brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Bryan Lamar Webb Attorney: Stephanie Marie Adraktas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketBrief: Wende brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Bryan Lamar WebbAttorney: Stephanie Marie Adraktas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed augmented record pursuant to rule 8.340.; Notes: C-1, R-1 (25 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.; Notes: Dtd Dec 2, 2020; By appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Stephanie Adraktas for appellant; AOB due Dec 23, 2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-1, R-1 & rec'd sealed p.o. report (96 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: County clerk extension granted.; Notes: to Oct 7, 2020 to prepare record on appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Dtd Sep 17, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Dtd Sep 16, 2020; Bryan Lamar Webb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Dtd Sep 14, 2020; Bryan Lamar Webb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: FWV1400676; Trial Court Judge: Ferguson, Jon

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant