This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/09/2023 at 02:14:28 (UTC).

The People v. Brown

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Campos, Yvonne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1445

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Campos, Yvonne

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Gregory Terence Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sheila Lavery O'Connor

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

09/29/2023

HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF. Due on 09/29/2023 By 30 Day(s) no further

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF. Due on 08/30/2023 By 30 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Gregory Terence Brown Attorney: Sheila Lavery O'Connor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Appellant's application for permission to file sealed and public redacted versions of the opening brief is DENIED. Appellant has not provided facts sufficient to justify sealing. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.47(c); 8.46(d); 2.550(d)-(e). The clerk is directed to return the appellant's opening brief to counsel. (Rule 8.47(c)(2)(D).) Appellant's opening brief is due within 10 days from the date of this order. NO EXTENSIONS.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 09/29/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: The PeopleAttorney: Office of the Attorney General

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/29/2023

DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S OPENING BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Gregory Terence BrownAttorney: Sheila Lavery O'Connor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/27/2023

DocketDescription: Application filed.; Notes: File AOB under seal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: Four mental competency reports

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/09/2023

DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: Clerk's-1 (25), Reporter's-3 (27)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: last

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/28/2023

DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: Probation report filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/2023

DocketDescription: RECORD ON APPEAL FILED.************; Notes: Clerk's-2 (357), Reporter's-12 (657), 1-Prelim. Hearing (38), and Master Index 9-Yrs.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/25/2023

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Sheila O'Connor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: Filed January 12, 2023 - Brown

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/11/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: SCD287766; Trial Court Judge: Campos, Yvonne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less