This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/24/2022 at 02:19:41 (UTC).

The People v. Brizuela; Appellate Division

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Brizuela Appellate Division. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coats, Benjamin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7097

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coats, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

The People

Appellate Division of the Superior Court, County of Ventura

Hon. Benjamin F. Coats 800 S. Victoria Ave.

Ventura, CA 93009

Defendant and Appellant

Justo Merlin Rodas Brizuela

Other

Superior Court, County of Ventura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

300 South Spring St. 1St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Office of the District Attorney

800 South Victoria Avenue 3Rd Floor Hoj

Ventura, CA 93009

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

William McCarthy Quest

Attorney at Ofc Public Defender

800 S Victoria Ave 2Fl

Ventura, CA 93009

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: File(s) returned to county clerk.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final GP/Dissent by J. Tangeman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transfer/certification denied.; Notes: We deny the petition to transfer. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.1002.) GP/Dissent by J. Tangeman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: File(s) received from county clerk.; Notes: one folder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Petition for Transfer; 1 Vol. (29p)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition to transfer from appellate division filed.; Notes: by J. Brizuela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 2020011354; Trial Court Judge: Coats, Benjamin

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court, County of Ventura is a litigant

Latest cases where Appellate Division of the Superior Court is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William McCarthy Quest