This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/09/2021 at 00:12:21 (UTC).

The People v. Allyson Johnson

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 The People filed an Other lawsuit against Allyson Johnson. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schwartz, Bernard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7381

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Schwartz, Bernard

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

The People

Appellant and Defendant

Allyson Morley Johnson

San Diego, CA 92101-2396

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Office Of The State Attorney General

P. O. Box 85266

San Diego, CA 92186-5266

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Stephanie Marie Adraktas

2625 Alcatraz Avenue #233

Berkeley, CA 94705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Probation report filed; Notes: rec'd sealed p.o. report

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RMI-1, R-5 (797 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (301 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Mail returned, unable to forward.; Notes: appellant's copy of counsel appointment order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel with exhibit form attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Stephanie Adraktas for appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Jul 8, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received (criminal).; Notes: dtd Jul 7, 2021; Allyson Morley Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIF1904942; Trial Court Judge: Schwartz, Bernard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Adraktas