This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/04/2022 at 15:01:49 (UTC).

The People of the State of California, et al. v. Johnson & Johnson et al.

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 The People of the State of California filed an Other lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1130

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Peter

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

The People of the State of California,

Office of the County Counsel County of Santa Clara

Office of the County Counsel County of Los Angeles

Office of the County Counsel City of Oakland

Orange County District Attorney

Respondents and Defendants

Johnson & Johnson

Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.,

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Alergen plc

Allergen Finance, LLC

Cephalon, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Actavis, LLC

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Williams

Attorney at Santa Clara County Counsel

70 W Hedding St Fl 9 East Wing

San Jose, CA 95110

Rodrigo Alejandro Castro-Silva

Attorney at L.A. County Office of the County Counsel

500 W. Temple St., 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Barbara Jean Parker

Attorney at Office of Oakland City Attorney

1 Frank H Ogawa Plz Fl 6

Oakland, CA 94612

Todd A. Spitzer

Attorney at Orange County District Attorney

401 Civic Center Dr

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Yoder

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers LLP

610 Newport Center Dr, 17Th Floor

Newport Beach, CA 92660

John Charles Hueston

Attorney at Hueston Hennigan, LLP

620 Newport Center Dr Ste 1300

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Collie Fitch James, IV

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius LLP

600 Anton Blvd., Suite 1800

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Intra District Transfer; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Intra District Transfer to:; Notes: Under Rule 10.1000(b)(1)A, California Rules of Court, the above appeal is transferred from Division Three to Division One of the Fourth Appellate District.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: re: California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(b)(1).Due to clerical error, a notice was issued to appellant pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.100(b)(1) on February 22, 2022. That notice is rescinded. Fees for appellant are exempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exempt filing fee.; Notes: By Appellant The People of the State of California, et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By Appellants The People of the State of California, acting by and through Santa Clara County Counsel Orry O. Korb and Orange County District Attorney Tony Rackauckas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2014-00725287; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Peter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County District Attorney is a litigant

Latest cases where JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA PRODUCTS LP is a litigant

Latest cases where OFFICE OF THE COUNTY COUNSEL is a litigant

Latest cases where Allergan Finance LLC is a litigant