This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/21/2021 at 02:57:29 (UTC).

The Office of the State Controller v. Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 11/30/2017 The Office of the State Controller filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kahn, Harold. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3001

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kahn, Harold

 

Party Details

Petitioner

The Office of the State Controller

Respondent

Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Party

Thrivent Financial for Lutherans

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steven Siegmund Rosenthal

Attorney at Loeb & Loeb, LLP

10100 Santa Monica Blvd., Suite 2200

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Interested Party Attorneys

Thomas Victor Loran, III.

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman

Four Embarcadero Center - 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Andrew B. Kay

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1200 - 19Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

Andrew D. Lanphere

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

P. Randolph Seybold

Attorney at Cozen O'Connor

1200 19Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

A153001

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: The requests to appear as counsel pro hac vice are granted. The petition for review is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: (paper) Reply to Answer to Petition for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review received.; Notes: (paper)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of Supreme Court filing.; Notes: verified application for admission of Andrew B. Kay, ESQ., as counsel pro hac vice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: PLAINTIFF/REAL-PARTY IN INTEREST THRIVENT FINANCIAL FOR LUTHERANS (Cal. Supreme Court Case No. S254115)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Order denying rehearing petition filed.; Notes: Real party in interest's petition for rehearing is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: PLAINTIFF/REAL-PARTY IN INTEREST THRIVENT FINANCIAL FOR LUTHERANS

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 12/19/2017
  • DocketDescription: Telephone conversation with:; Notes: Alicia Clough with Loeb and Loeb, counsel for petitioner, re: will court allow a reply to be filed; checked with court a reply must be filed on or before Jan. 3, 2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: RPI's Exhibit to Preliminary Response

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • DocketDescription: Response filed to:; Notes: RPI's Preliminary Response to Petitions for Writ of Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketDescription: Opposition requested.; Notes: due on or before December 18, 2017, w/Palma notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Government entity exempt.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 35

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • DocketDescription: Case start date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC16550604; Trial Court Judge: Kahn, Harold

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Office of the State Controller is a litigant

Latest cases where TRIVENT FINANCIAL FOR LUTHERANS is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the City and County of San Francisco is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lanphere, Andrew D.