This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2022 at 02:41:08 (UTC).

The Law Firm of Fox & Fox v. Arias

Case Summary

On 02/11/2021 The Law Firm of Fox Fox filed an Other lawsuit against Arias. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0750

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

The Law Firm of Fox & Fox

Appellant and Defendant

Rebecca Arias

Los Angeles, CA 90006

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Frank O. Fox

Attorney at The Law Firm of Fox and Fox

4262 Wilshire Blvd. Third Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Your submitted filing has been rejected. This appeal was dismissed on June 21, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Appellant's motion for reinstatement was received on July 23, 2021. The appeal was dismissed by order dated June 21, 2021. This court's order became final as to this court on July 21, 2021, thirty (30) days after its filing (see Rule 8.264(b), California Rules of Court). This court is without jurisdiction to rule on this motion.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Received but did not file appellant's motion for reinstatement and to file a late civil case information statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Your submitted filing has been rejected. This appeal was dismissed on June 21, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed February 11, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Superior Court document entitled: Appellant's Proposed Settled Statement filed in trial court on March 12, 2021 received on May 24, 2021 is returned to appellant. The record on appeal for the Feb. 11, 2021 appeal is being prepared by LASC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement with Court of Appeal case number B301578 received on May 24, 2021 is being returned to appellant, Rebecca Arias. The document has the wrong Court of Appeal case number for the February 11, 2021 appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's motion filed on May 24, 2021 for reinstatement and request to file late case information statement for the appeal filed February 11, 2021. The Court's ruling is as follows: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the order of dismissal filed April 27, 2021 is vacated and the appeal filed February 11, 2021 is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from default for failure to file a timely civil case information statement. Appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order, serve and file with this Court, a complete civil case information statement, including copy of signed judgment or order being appealed. If appellant fails to cure the default in timely manner, the appeal will be dismissed without further notice. (Cal. Rules of Court, rules 8.100(g); 8.25(a)(1)-(2).) In addition, the Clerk of the Superior Court is to proceed with the preparation of the record on appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Appellant's motion for reinstatement and request to file late case information statement.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed February 11, 2021, is dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee Waiver granted on Mar 26, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Feb. 11, 2021: Rebecca Arias

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC590351

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE LAW FIRM OF FOX AND FOX is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FOX FRANK OLIVER