Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/26/2021 at 14:50:41 (UTC).

The Boeson Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003 et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/01/2020 The Boeson Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003 filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Landin, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7824

  • Filing Date:

    10/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Landin, Dennis

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Peter Boesen

Stacy Boesen

The Boeson Living Trust Dated June 18, 2003

Respondents

Hon. Dennis J. Landin

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Afua Adjei

Neil Erickson

Marisol Ocampo

Timothy Lappen

Century Law Group, LLP

Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell, LLP

Edward Lear

Does 1 through 200

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Steven L. Zelig

Attorney at Bay Cities Law Group, Inc.

1046 Princeton Dr., #201

Marina Del Rey, CA 90292

Respondent Attorneys

Presiding Judge

Los Angeles Superior Court 111 N. Hill St., Dept. 051

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Dan P. Sedor

Attorney at Jeffer, Mangels, Butler & Mitchell LLP

1900 Avenue Of The Stars 7Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-5010

Frances Mary O'Meara

Attorney at Thompson Coe & O'Meara

12100 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: We have read and considered (1) the petition for writ of mandate filed on October 1, 2020, (2) the preliminary opposition filed by real parties in interest Neil Erickson, Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP and Timothy Lappen on October 9, 2020, and (3) the reporter's transcript of proceedings that took place in the respondent court on September 1, 2020, which transcript was submitted to this court by petitioners on October 30, 2020. The petition is denied. EDMON, P. J. LAVIN, J. DHANIDINA, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered (1) the petition for writ of mandate filed on October 1, 2020, (2) the preliminary opposition filed by real parties in interest Neil Erickson, Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP and Timothy Lappen on October 9, 2020, and (3) the reporter's transcript of proceedings that took place in the respondent court on September 1, 2020, which transcript was submitted to this court by petitioners on October 30, 2020. The petition is denied. EDMON, P. J. LAVIN, J. DHANIDINA, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of filing - REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS - TUESDAY, SEPTEMBER 1, 2020Attorneys for Petitioners Peter Boesen, etc., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive Filing Fee Paid by First Legal for: Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell, LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: by Real Parties in Interest Neil Erickson, Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP and Timothy Lappen (collectively, "JMBM") submits preliminary opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BOESEN LIVING TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURY LAW GROUP LLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant