This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/22/2021 at 01:37:02 (UTC).

The Athletics Investment Group, LLC v. California Department of Toxic Substances Control

Case Summary

On 08/11/2021 The Athletics Investment Group, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against California Department of Toxic Substances Control. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Herbert, Paul. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3291

  • Filing Date:

    08/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Herbert, Paul

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

The Athletics Investment Group, LLC

California Department of Toxic Substances Control

Interested Party and Appellant

Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

California Department of Toxic Substances Control

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric H. MacMichael

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111-1809

William Milligan Sloan

Attorney at Venable LLP

101 California Street Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Tyler Guy Welti

Attorney at Venable LLP

101 California Street Suite 3800

San Francisco, CA 94111

R. James Slaughter

Attorney at Keker, Van Nest & Peters LLP

633 Battery Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Elizabeth B Rumsey

Attorney at CA Dept of Justice/Attorney General Ofc

1515 Clay St Fl 20

Oakland, CA 94612

Dennis L Beck, Jr

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I St Ste 125

Sacramento, CA 95814-2951

Interested Party and Appellant Attorneys

Margaret Nell Rosegay

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ronald Edward Van Buskirk

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman

Four Embarcadero Center 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stacey Coy Wright

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

Kevin Murray Fong

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth B Rumsey

Attorney at CA Dept of Justice/Attorney General Ofc

1515 Clay St Fl 20

Oakland, CA 94612

Dennis L Beck, Jr

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

1300 I St Ste 125

Sacramento, CA 95814-2951

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record returned from Supreme Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court.; Notes: efile notification sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 12/22/2021 By 30 Day(s) to 12/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Partial THE COURT:* The Athletics Investment Group LLC's request for judicial notice is denied. The petition for a writ of supersedeas is denied. (tuc,fuj,cho)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The Athletics Investment Group LLC?s request for judicial notice is denied. The petition for a writ of supersedeas is denied. (tuc,fuj,cho)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: By respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: By respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: California Department of Toxic Substances Control Attorney: Elizabeth B Rumsey California Department of Toxic Substances Control

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2 of 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1 of 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: or Other Appropriate Relief to Preserve the Status Quo and Stay Judgment Pending the Appeal from Judgment on Petition for Writ of Mandate and Post-Judgment Order Lifting Automatic Stay

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc. Attorney: Kevin Murray Fong Attorney: Margaret Nell Rosegay Attorney: Ronald Edward Van Buskirk Attorney: Stacey Coy Wright with order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 12/22/2021; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.Attorney: Kevin Murray Fong Attorney: Margaret Nell Rosegay Attorney: Ronald Edward Van Buskirk Attorney: Stacey Coy Wright

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest and Appellant: Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc.Attorney: Kevin Murray Fong Attorney: Margaret Nell Rosegay Attorney: Ronald Edward Van Buskirk Attorney: Stacey Coy Wright; Notes: with order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 138271, Legal Support Network, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/11/2021 by Counsel for Real Party in Interest Schnitzer Steel Industries, Inc. appealing order from 08/10/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20069917; Trial Court Judge: Herbert, Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TOXIC SUBSTANCES CONTROL is a litigant

Latest cases where ATHLETICS INVESTMENT GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SCHNITZER STEEL INDUSTRIES, INC. is a litigant