This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/11/2021 at 12:02:03 (UTC).

Thaker v. Smitray Inc

Case Summary

On 06/23/2016 Thaker filed an Other lawsuit against Smitray Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is See, Ramona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5859

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 4

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

See, Ramona

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Chetan Thaker

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant and Respondent

Smitray Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Robert W. Conti

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2050 Main St. Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2016
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2016
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check #136771 for 390

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Motion to dismiss filed (before record).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Fee waiver filed in SCLA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Chetan Thakar June 23, 2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: YC064739; Trial Court Judge: See, Ramona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITRAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONTI ROBERT W. ESQ.