This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/11/2021 at 12:02:17 (UTC).

Thakar v. Smitray, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/15/2016 Thakar filed an Other lawsuit against Smitray, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is See, Ramona. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6436

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

See, Ramona

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Chetan Thakar

Long Beach, CA 90807

Respondents and Defendants

S.D.P. Investments, Inc.

Smitray, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Robert W. Conti

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2050 Main St. Suite 900

Irvine, CA 92614

Barry Z. Brodsky

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jodi L. Girten

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

11755 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

B276436

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Willhite, Jr., Thomas Lyle; Participants: Collins, Audrey B. (Concur) Manella, Nora M. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.; Notes: Appellant waived oral argument. Attorney Brian Peters argued on behalf of respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Jodi Girten will argue on behalf of respondent 10 min

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketDescription: Waiver of oral argument filed by:; Notes: Appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: August 17, 2018 at 09:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Chetan Thakar Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: to designate the record (will be considered after the disposition of the response to vexatious litigant matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2016
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: NOTICE On August 1, 2016 the Court issued a Stay of all proceedings in this matter. Therefore, the application for extension of time received on November 14, 2016 will be held in abeyance until the resolution of the vexatious litigant status of the appeal filed on July 15, 2016. The Los Angele Superior Court, Civil Appeals Unit has been notified of the stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2016
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: August 05, 2016 (original notice), appellant granted extension of time to October 30, 2016 to file designation of record. None filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: to 10/30/2016 to file the designation of the record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Application by appellant to extend time to file designation of record on appeal to 9/30/2016 is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: by appellant to extend time to file designation of record on appeal to 9/30/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2016
  • DocketDescription: Response filed:; Notes: Appellant's response to vexatious litigant notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: It has come to the attention of the Court that plaintiff has previously been found to be a vexatious litigant within the meaning of Code of Civil Procedure section 391.7, subdivision (a). Pursuant to section 391.7, subdivision (c) of the Code of Civil Procedure, all proceedings are hereby stayed. Within 10 days of the date of this notice plaintiff shall show in writing "that the litigation has merit and has not been taken for purposes of harassment or delay." (Code Civ. Proc., sec. 391.7, subd. (b)). If plaintiff fails to respond to this notice in a timely manner, or if the response fails to demonstrate the merit of the action herein, the appeal shall be dismissed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed July 15, 2016 -- Chetan Thakar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2016
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: YC064739; Trial Court Judge: See, Ramona

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SMITRAY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where S.D.P. INVESTMENTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIRTEN JODI L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CONTI ROBERT W. ESQ.