This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/09/2021 at 10:13:23 (UTC).

TAYLOR v. IVIE

Case Summary

On 03/11/2021 TAYLOR filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against IVIE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7492

  • Filing Date:

    03/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Thris Van Taylor

Inglewood, CA 90301

Respondents and Defendants

Rickey Ivie

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2919

Eloise Ivie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Thris Van Taylor

Attorney at Law Offices of Thris Van Taylor

110 South La Brea Avenue, Suite 475

Inglewood, CA 90301

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Manuel Dominguez

Attorney at Richardson Fair & Cohen

3700 Central Avenue, 3Rd Floor

Riverside, CA 92506

Mark Taylor Petersen

Attorney at Richardson, Fair & Cohen

3700 Central Avenue, 3Rd Floor

Riverside, CA 92506-2421

Chandler Adrian Parker

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt, APLC

444 S. Flower Street, Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Marie B Maurice

Attorney at Ivie McNeill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rickey Ivie

Attorney at Ivie, McNeill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2919

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: 1 box

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including June 9, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One box.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Thris Van Taylor Attorney: Thris Van Taylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Thris Van Taylor Attorney: Thris Van Taylor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B281545; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC268576; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC317765; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BS098998

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYLOR THRIS VAN