This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/29/2022 at 02:24:58 (UTC).

Tawansy v. RIF Investments - 3 LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Tawansy filed an Other lawsuit against RIF Investments - 3 LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3467

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Khaled A. Tawansy

Respondent and Defendant

RIF Investments - 3 LLC

Not Yet Classified

Martin Dodd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Armen F Papazian

Attorney at Papazian Law, APC

15260 Ventura Blvd #960

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Armand Aris Avazian

Attorney at Avazian & Avazian

707 Wilshire Blvd Ste 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3541

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Saul Reiss

Attorney at Law Offices of Saul Reiss, PC

11835 W Olympic Blvd, Ste 415E

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed June 9, 2021, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: counsel regarding mediation outcome.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Oct 27, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference held.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference scheduled for:; Notes: September 2, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (Dodd)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Counsel for respondent.Law Offices of Saul Reiss, PC 11835 W Olympic Blvd, Ste 415E, Los Angeles, CA 90064

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Khaled A. Tawansy Attorney: Armand Aris Avazian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Khaled A. TawansyAttorney: Armand Aris Avazian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Request for Mediation.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card; Khaled A. Tawansy, Plaintiff and Appellant Armen F Papazian, Retained counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 6/9/2021 by Khaled A. Tawansy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC605613; Trial Court Judge: Fujie, Holly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less