This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/28/2021 at 00:00:42 (UTC).

Sylvania, L.P. v. ACRE Investment Real Estate Services, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Sylvania, L P filed an Other lawsuit against ACRE Investment Real Estate Services, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitney, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8152

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Whitney, Richard

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Appellant

Sylvania, L.P.

Cross Defendants and Respondents

ACRE Investment Real Estate Services, Inc.

Kenneth Herskind

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Appellant Attorney

Kent L. Sharp

Attorney at La Jolla Law Group

9404 Genesee Avenue, Ste. 300

La Jolla, CA 92037

Cross Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Traci S Lagasse

4365 Executive Dr., Ste. 950

San Diego, CA 92121

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2021
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED. Due on 03/26/2021 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: RT - 2 (606 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Change of firm name and handling attorney for LAGASSE BRANCH BELL + KINKEAD LLP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Sylvania, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 9/18/20 by Sylvania, L.P.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2017-00017395-CU-OR-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Whitney, Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sylvania, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAGASSE, TRACI S