This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/04/2022 at 14:55:01 (UTC).

SWIFTAIR v. SOUTHWEST AIRLINES

Case Summary

On 05/06/2022 SWIFTAIR filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SOUTHWEST AIRLINES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4178

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Swiftair, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

Southwest Airlines Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis Matthew Holmgren

Attorney at Holmgren Mitchell Johnson Madden, LLP

12801 North Central Expressway Suite 140

Dallas, TX 75234

Stephen Ray Tittle

Attorney at Shamoun & Norman, LLP

1800 Valley View Lane, Suite 200

Farmers Branch, TX 75234-8944

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Douglas D. D' Arche

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Teresa Carey Chow

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Gerald Edward Hawxhurst

10880 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Gerald E. Hawxhurst

Attorney at Hawxhurst LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 620

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David S. Harris

Attorney at David S. Harris P.C.

6520 Platt Avenue, Suite 683

West Hills, CA 91307

Patrick B. Nichols

Attorney at Hawxhurst Harris LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard, Suite 620

Los Angeles, CA 90025-3340

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: one file jacket, two doghouses (volumes 2 & 3)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Swiftair, LLC Attorney: Dennis Matthew Holmgren Attorney: Stephen Ray Tittle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Southwest Airlines Co. Attorney: Gerald E. Hawxhurst

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: One file jacket(volume 1), two doghouses (volumes 2 and 3).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Swiftair, LLC Attorney: Dennis Matthew Holmgren Attorney: Stephen Ray Tittle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Swiftair, LLC Attorney: Dennis Matthew Holmgren Attorney: Stephen Ray Tittle *Order granting publication filed 4/5/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 7; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303314; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: SC122964

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swiftair, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harris, David S.