This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 03/30/2022 at 07:57:36 (UTC).

SWIFTAIR v. ROW 44

Case Summary

On 08/20/2021 SWIFTAIR filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ROW 44. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0484

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Swiftair

Defendants and Respondents

Row 44, Inc.

Southwest Airlines Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis Matthew Holmgren

Attorney at Holmgren Johnson: Mitchell Madden, LLP

12801 North Central Expressway Suite 140

Dallas, TX 75234

Stephen Ray Tittle

Attorney at Shamoun & Norman, LLP

1800 Valley View Lane, Suite 200 Suite 200

Farmers Branch, TX 75234-8944

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Martin D. Katz

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin et al., LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Dylan John Price

Attorney at Sheppard Mullin

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6017

Teresa Carey Chow

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Douglas D. D' Arche

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

811 Main Street Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Gerald Edward Hawxhurst

Attorney at Hawxhurst Harris LLP

11111 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 620

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 18, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Row 44, Inc. Attorney: Dylan John Price

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Swiftair Attorney: Dennis Matthew Holmgren Attorney: Stephen Ray Tittle

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Row 44, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Swiftair, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHWEST AIRLINES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAWXHURST GERALD EDWARD