This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/23/2022 at 01:06:07 (UTC).

Swanson et al. v. Franchise Tax Board of the State of California et al.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Swanson filed an Other lawsuit against Franchise Tax Board of the State of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dahlquist, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9315

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dahlquist, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Appellants

David W. Swanson

Connie L. Swanson

Plaintiffs, Appellants and Respondents

David W. Swanson

Connie L. Swanson

Franchise Tax Board of the State of California

State Board of Equalization of the State of California

Office of Tax Appeals

Defendants, Appellants and Respondents

Franchise Tax Board of the State of California

State Board of Equalization of the State of California

Office of Tax Appeals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Peter J. Pfund

4675 Macarthur Court, Suite 550

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Joe Alfred Jr. Izen

5526 Mcknight Street

Houston, TX 77035

Plaintiff, Appellant and Respondent Attorneys

Peter J. Pfund

4675 Macarthur Court, Suite 550

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Joe Alfred Jr. Izen

5526 Mcknight Street

Houston, TX 77035

Douglas Jose Beteta

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Lisa W Chao

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

300 S Spring St

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

Appellant, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Douglas Jose Beteta

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

300 South Spring Street, Suite 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Lisa W Chao

Attorney at Attorney General's Office

300 S Spring St

Los Angeles, CA 90013-1230

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF. Due on 07/11/2022 By 62 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: R/10 (Conditional)(In-person)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: A/15 (Remote)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.; Notes: 5/2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Franchise Tax Board of the State of California Attorney: Douglas Jose Beteta Defendant and Respondent: State Board of Equalization of the State of California Attorney: Douglas Jose Beteta Defendant and Respondent: Office of Tax Appeals Attorney: Douglas Jose Beteta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF.; Due Date: 07/11/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: David W. SwansonAttorney: Joe Alfred Jr. Izen Attorney: Peter J. Pfund

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Franchise Tax Board of the State of CaliforniaAttorney: Douglas Jose Beteta Defendant and Respondent: State Board of Equalization of the State of CaliforniaAttorney: Douglas Jose Beteta Defendant and Respondent: Office of Tax AppealsAttorney: Douglas Jose Beteta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Last

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Pro hac vice granted.; Notes: The application of Joe Alfred Izen, Jr., to appear pro hac vice on behalf of appellants is GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 7/14/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: CT and RT - 7/9/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 6/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 6/17/21 by David W. Swanon and Connie L. Swanson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2019-00030244-CU-MC-NC; Trial Court Judge: Dahlquist, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OFFICE OF TAX APPEALS OTA is a litigant

Latest cases where STATE BOARD OF EQUALIZATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FRANCHISE TAX BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BETETA DOUGLAS J.