This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/09/2021 at 01:44:20 (UTC).

Svegliato v. U.S. Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Svegliato filed an Other lawsuit against U S Bank, N A. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kim, Mark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3697

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kim, Mark

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Daniel Svegliato

Respondent and Defendant

U.S. Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Dean Thompson Kirby

Attorney at Kirby & McGuinn, A P.C.

707 Broadway Suite 1750

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Nicole S. Dunn

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak, LLP

4665 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Jonathan D. Fink

Attorney at Wright Finlay & Zak LLP

4665 Macarthur Court Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660-5704

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Jonathan D Fink of Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP dated 9/20/2021 re: Nicole Dunn will no longer be representing respondent US Bank, N.A., she is no longer with Wright, Finlay & Zak, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 17, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel Svegliato Attorney: Dean Thompson Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel SvegliatoAttorney: Dean Thompson Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Peters, Jennifer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on June 1, 2021 by Daniel Svegliato

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19LBCV00423; Trial Court Judge: Kim, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DUNN NICOLE STEPHANIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FINK JONATHAN D. ESQ.