This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/13/2023 at 10:00:32 (UTC).

Suzuki Motor Corporation v. The Superior Court of Orange County

Case Summary

On 12/13/2021 Suzuki Motor Corporation filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Orange County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0958

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Suzuki Motor Corporation

Respondent

The Superior Court of Orange County

Attn: Hon Glenn R. Salter N-6 1275 North Berkeley Avenue

Fullerton, CA 92832

Interested Party

Thomas Joseph Soulliere

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Lori A. Schweitzer

Attorney at BHC Law Group LLP

5900 Hollis Street, Suite O

Emeryville, CA 94608

Robert A. Brundage

Attorney at BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP

1741 Technology Drive Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95110

Interested Party Attorneys

Robert Terrence Simon

Attorney at The Simon Law Group

34 Hermosa Avenue

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Troy Gabriel Houston

Attorney at Houston Law of California, PC

330 Main St Ste 203B

Seal Beach, CA 90740-6352

Jon Robert Williams

Attorney at Williams Iagmin LLP

2475 Kettner Blvd.

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: ALL documents scanned. No paper copies.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.; Notes: Filed June 1, 2022. The petition for review is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review received.; Notes: Filed with Supreme Court by RPI.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: Received assosication of counsel for RPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: by petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final; Author: Goethals, Thomas M.; Participants: Sanchez, Maurice Moore, Eileen C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is DENIED. Having reviewed the record, it appears respondent court complied with our remittitur. MOORE, ACTING P. J. * Before Moore, Acting P. J., Goethals, J., and Sanchez, J.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Informal reply by Petitioner per order 12-15-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case briefed and on assignment panel.; Notes: March Assignment.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Informal response filed by:; Notes: Real Party in Interest: Thomas Joseph Soulliere Attorney: Robert Terrence Simon Attorney: Troy Gabriel Houston

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketBrief: Informal response filed by:; Party Attorney: Real Party in Interest: Thomas Joseph SoulliereAttorney: Robert Terrence Simon Attorney: Troy Gabriel Houston

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The parties' joint request to extend the deadlines for informal briefing is GRANTED. Real Party in interest may file preliminary opposition or other informal response to the petition by January 3, 2022. Petitioner may file an informal reply by January 18, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Joint request of petitioner and real party in interest to extend deadlines to file informal response and informal reply.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On December 9, 2021, appellant filed a notice of appeal from orders entered on October 8, 2021 and November 4, 2021 (case No. G060951). On December 13, 2021, appellant filed a petition for writ of mandate challenging the same orders (case No. G060958). Real Party in interest may file preliminary opposition or other informal response to the petition within 10 days of the filing of this order. No filing fee is required for this response requested by the court. Petitioner may file an informal reply within 10 days of any response filed by real party in interest.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits in support of petition for Writ of Mandate 4 Volumes (4301 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by Suzuki Motor Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUZUKI MOTOR OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where The Superior Court of Orange County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Troy Gabriel Houston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jon R. Williams