This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/22/2022 at 05:04:53 (UTC).

SUTTER'S PLACE v. CALIFORNIA GAMBLING CONTROL COMMISSION

Case Summary

On 07/22/2022 SUTTER'S PLACE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALIFORNIA GAMBLING CONTROL COMMISSION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5657

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Sutter's Place, Inc.

Respondent and Defendant

California Gambling Control Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew T. Schechter

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113-2415

James H. McManis

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Richard Tyler Atkinson

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 W. San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

James Glenn Waian

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 W Broadway, Suite 1800

San Diego, CA 92101-3375

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: James G. Waian, counsel for respondent California Gambling Control Commission respectfully informs the Court that it does not intend to file an answer to the Petition for Review unless one is requested by the Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sutter's Place, Inc. Attorney: Matthew T. Schechter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A163287; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CPF21517433

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Gambling Control Commission is a litigant

Latest cases where Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Glenn Waian