This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/14/2022 at 00:35:16 (UTC).

Sutter's Place, Inc. v. California Gambling Control Commission

Case Summary

On 08/03/2021 Sutter's Place, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against California Gambling Control Commission. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ulmer, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3287

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ulmer, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Appellant

Sutter's Place, Inc.

Respondent

California Gambling Control Commission

Interested Parties

City of San Jose

Garden City, Inc. dba Casino M8trix

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Appellant Attorneys

Christine Elizabeth Peek

Fairmont Plaza 10Th Fl 50 W San Fernando St

San Jose, CA 95113

Richard Tyler Atkinson

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

Fairmont Plaza 50 W San Fernando St 10Th Fl

San Jose, CA 95113

James H. McManis

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 West San Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Matthew T. Schechter

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

50 W San Fernando St Ste 1000

San Jose, CA 95113-2415

Respondent Attorney

James Glenn Waian

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

600 W Broadway Ste 1800

San Diego, CA 92101-3375

Interested Party Attorneys

Malgorzata Laskowska

Attorney at Office Of The City Attorney

200 East Santa Clara Street, 16Th Floor City Of San Jose

San Jose, CA 95113-1905

Maureen Harrington

Attorney at Greenfield, LLP

55 S Market St Ste 1500

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsels regarding BlueJeans Video Oral Argument Practice Session on Thursday, May 12, 2022 at 10:00 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsels regarding BlueJeans link for OA & Best Practices for Video OA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No response from parties to waive OA; this case remains on calendar for May 16, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument order sent.; Notes: 5-16-22 @ 9:30 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Appellant, Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101, hereby removes Christine Peek, formerly of McManis Faulkner, as one of its attorney of record, as she is no longer with the firm. The responsible attorneys for Appellant are as follows: James McManis, Matthew Schechter and Richard Tyler Atkinson.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: James G. Waian, attorney for Respondent California Gambling Control Commission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: James McManis, attorney for appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record to court for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 22-2

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Christine Peek in Support of Appellant's Motion for Calendar Preference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Calendar Preference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RT attached to designation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/12/21; designating 8.124 with RT (RT attached to designation)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Sutter's Place, Inc. Attorney: Christine Elizabeth Peek Christine Peek, attorney for Appellant Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101, with copy of Order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Sutter's Place, Inc.Attorney: Christine Elizabeth Peek; Notes: Christine Peek, attorney for Appellant Sutter's Place, Inc. dba Bay 101, with copy of Order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 15451, McManis Faulkner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/03/2021 by Counsel for Petitioner Sutter's Place, Inc. appealing order from 07/09/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF21517433; Trial Court Judge: Ulmer, Jr., Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Gambling Control Commission is a litigant

Latest cases where Sutter's Place, Inc. a California Corportion doing business as Bay 101 Casino is a litigant

Latest cases where CITY OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases where GARDENA CITY OF is a litigant